Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Carinci

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Boiano-Campobasso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1899BornLanciano
11 Mar 192223.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 194041.0AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
19 May 194041.1Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
28 Apr 194849.1AppointedBishop of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy
11 Feb 197373.9AppointedArchbishop of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy
31 Jan 197777.8RetiredArchbishop of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy
18 Jul 198384.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Carinci:
Archbishop Alberto Carinci (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Boiano-Campobasso

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013