Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio d’Agostino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vallo di Lucania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1896Born
3 Apr 192629.9Ordained PriestPriest of Termoli, Italy
15 Dec 195155.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Termoli, Italy
15 Dec 195155.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
3 Feb 195255.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
14 May 195458.0AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
24 Feb 195659.8AppointedBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy
26 Oct 197478.4RetiredBishop of Vallo di Lucania, Italy
26 Mar 198487.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Vallo di Lucania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio d’Agostino
Bishop Biagio d’Agostino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vallo di Lucania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTermoli

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast