Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oddo Bernacchia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larino

Titular Bishop of Sebela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1880BornFano
19 Sep 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Fano, Italy
1 Oct 192444.5AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
5 Oct 192444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
28 Oct 192444.6AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
11 Nov 196080.7RetiredBishop of Larino, Italy
19 Mar 196282.0RetiredBishop of Termoli, Italy
19 Mar 196282.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebela
13 Nov 196484.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Oddo Bernacchia:
Bishop Oddo Bernacchia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larino

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,541
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013