Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geremia Pascucci

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1881Born
12 Sep 192241.1AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
17 Sep 192241.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
14 May 192644.8DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Geremia Pascucci
Bishop Geremia Pascucci (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018