Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Scozzoli

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1858Born
24 Sep 188123.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190042.7AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
31 Dec 190042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
9 Feb 194485.9DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Scozzoli
Bishop Vincenzo Scozzoli (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martino de Villafranca

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018