Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Jaffei

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1847Born
21 Sep 187224.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189547.3AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
5 May 189547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
22 Aug 193284.8DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Jaffei
Bishop Raimondo Jaffei (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnaia, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017