Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Bonetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1842Born
21 Dec 186725.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 188643.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
15 Jan 188643.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
24 Jan 188643.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
3 Apr 188744.6SucceededBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
Dec 1910²68.2ResignedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
20 Jul 191168.9DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bonetti (VIAF: 88855157)
Bishop Luigi Bonetti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalazzo d'Arcevia, Diocese of Fossombrone
Ordained BishopVII douleurs, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 381, and Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1886, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017