Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto Papiri (Pageri)

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1837Born
2 Jun 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 188750.6AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
11 Dec 188750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
29 Nov 189558.6AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
31 Mar 190669.0DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Papiri (Pageri) (VIAF: 307387337)
Archbishop Roberto Papiri (Pageri) (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefortino, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 272, and Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1887, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017