Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ferri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Titular Bishop of Livias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1868Born
14 Jun 189122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fano, Italy
27 Nov 191143.2AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
14 Jan 191243.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
18 Dec 192456.3AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 May 194677.7RetiredBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
17 May 194677.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Livias
17 May 194677.7RetiredBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
30 Jan 195283.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ferri
Bishop Luigi Ferri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018