Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Del Signore

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1881Born
19 Sep 190322.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 193756.5AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
24 Oct 193756.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
13 Jan 193856.8InstalledBishop of Fano, Italy
13 Mar 196785.9DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Del Signore
Bishop Vincenzo Del Signore (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaltara

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,937, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast