Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Delio Lucarelli

Bishop Emeritus of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1939 Born
29 Jun 196525.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 199657.0AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
6 Jan 199757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
15 May 201575.4RetiredBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy

MicroData Summary for Delio Lucarelli
Bishop Delio Lucarelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,876
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast