Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pompili

Bishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1963 Born
6 Aug 198825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
15 May 201551.9AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
5 Sep 201552.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pompili
Bishop Domenico Pompili (born ) Bishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 May 2015
  • c2: CB, 22 Jun 2015
  • c3+: CB, 4 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,568

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast