Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Marcozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1873Born
14 Aug 192653.3AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
8 Dec 192653.7Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
21 Apr 194067.0DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Marcozzi
Bishop Giuseppe Marcozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ascoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 86
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast