Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Zanolini

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1866Born
22 Feb 191043.6AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
5 May 191043.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
8 Jul 191347.0AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
6 Dec 192357.4DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Zanolini
Bishop Pietro Zanolini (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerlara

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018