Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Pellizzo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1860BornFaedis
7 Jun 188424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
27 Jul 190646.4AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
19 Aug 190646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
24 Mar 192363.1ResignedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
24 Mar 192363.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
14 Aug 193676.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pellizzo: VIAF:26034214
Archbishop Luigi Pellizzo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013