Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Scarante

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1873Born
22 Aug 189623.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 192249.8AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
15 Apr 192350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
18 Dec 192451.8AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
30 Jun 193057.4AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
17 Dec 194471.8DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Scarante
Bishop Antonio Scarante (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsango di Campo San Martino

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018