Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Liverzani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1913BornGranarolo Faentino
23 Jul 193926.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 196248.9AppointedBishop of Frascati, Italy
1 Jul 196249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Frascati, Italy
11 Nov 198976.3RetiredBishop of Frascati, Italy
6 May 199581.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Frascati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Liverzani:
Bishop Luigi Liverzani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Frascati

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013