Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Matarrese

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Frascati, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1934Born
15 Mar 195924.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 198955.4AppointedBishop of Frascati, Italy
16 Dec 198955.5Ordained BishopBishop of Frascati, Italy
14 Jan 199055.6InstalledBishop of Frascati, Italy
2 Jul 200975.0RetiredBishop of Frascati, Italy
27 Jun 202086.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Frascati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Matarrese
Bishop Giuseppe Matarrese (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndria
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFrascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,675
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 27 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Jun 2020

Quantcast