Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Babini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1893BornFusignano
14 Apr 191825.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 193845.4AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
5 Nov 193845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
21 Oct 195057.5AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
9 Jun 197683.2RetiredBishop of Forli, Italy
27 Nov 198289.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Babini:
Bishop Paolo Babini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Forli

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013