Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Rossini

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1890BornSan Biagio d'Argenta
16 Jul 191524.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 194251.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ravenna, Italy
18 Jul 194251.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
24 Aug 194251.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
10 Mar 194756.5AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
5 Oct 196575.0DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Rossini:
Archbishop Angelo Rossini (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015