Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiliano Cagnoni

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1884BornAncona
19 Sep 190823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ravenna, Italy
5 May 193449.6AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
10 Jun 193449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
28 Sep 196984.9DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Cagnoni:
Bishop Emiliano Cagnoni (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalý

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1934, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013