Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Tamburini

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1886BornComacchio
18 Jul 190923.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 194155.1AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
27 Apr 194155.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
8 Jan 194457.9DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Tamburini:
Bishop Giacinto Tamburini (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • d: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 36, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015