Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gherardo Sante Menegazzi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1866BornRoveredo di Guŗ
1897²30.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Dec 192054.2AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
23 Jan 192154.3Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
1 Jul 193871.7ResignedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
1 Jul 193871.7AppointedTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
20 Oct 193872.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia
21 Jan 194578.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gherardo Sante Menegazzi:
Archbishop Gherardo Sante Menegazzi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1921, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013