Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cornelio Sebastiano Cuccarollo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto

Titular Archbishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1870BornCasoni di Mussolente
23 Sep 189323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Mar 192352.7AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
22 May 192352.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
24 Oct 193060.3AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
28 Feb 193160.6InstalledArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
10 Jul 195282.0RetiredArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
10 Jul 195282.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Proconnesus
24 May 196392.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cornelio Sebastiano Cuccarollo:
Archbishop Cornelio Sebastiano Cuccarollo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013