Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Carlo Francesco Origo

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1840Born
15 Aug 186222.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189555.0AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
21 Apr 189555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
13 Nov 192888.6DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Carlo Francesco Origo
Bishop Paolo Carlo Francesco Origo (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,895, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast