Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Paolo Angelo Ballerini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1814Born
16 Jul 183722.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 185944.7AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Dec 186046.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Mar 186752.5ResignedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Mar 186752.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
27 Mar 189782.5DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for Paolo Angelo Ballerini (VIAF: 72192378)
Patriarch Paolo Angelo Ballerini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCertosa di Pavia, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia
Death PlaceSeregno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Seregno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Current)San Giuseppe, Basilica, Seregno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 87, and Page 376
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016
  • op/c1: AT, 2 Jan 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017