Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Biffi, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1829Born
21 May 185323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1867²37.0AppointedPrefect of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}, Myanmar
7 Feb 188252.1AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
19 Feb 188252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
8 Nov 189666.8DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Biffi (VIAF: 3664559)
Bishop Eugenio Biffi P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017