Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Carsana

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1814Born
17 Dec 183622.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187157.5AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
19 Nov 187157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
31 Dec 188773.7DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Carsana
Bishop Pietro Carsana (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChignolo d'Isola
Ordained BishopSt. Alexandre, Cathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017