Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Verzeri

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1804Born
22 Mar 182823.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 185045.5SelectedBishop of Brescia, Italy
30 Sep 185045.9ConfirmedBishop of Brescia, Italy
3 Nov 185046.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
1 Dec 188379.1DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Verzeri (VIAF: 45687559)
Bishop Girolamo Verzeri (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017