Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Corna-Pellegrini

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1827Born
16 Mar 185022.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 187547.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brescia, Italy
31 Mar 187547.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
25 Apr 187547.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
1 Dec 188356.2SucceededBishop of Brescia, Italy
21 May 191385.6DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Corna-Pellegrini (VIAF: 304914149)
Bishop Giacomo Corna-Pellegrini (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisogne, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopBrescia, Diocese of Brescia

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 158, and Page 496
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,875, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast