Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bartolomeo Rovetta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hephaestus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1861Born
29 Mar 191149.4AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
23 Apr 191149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
16 Dec 192059.1ResignedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
16 Dec 192059.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
3 Mar 193371.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bartolomeo Rovetta
Bishop Giuseppe Bartolomeo Rovetta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastenedolo

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018