Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Meraviglia Mantegazza

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1837Born
2 Jun 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 May 189457.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 May 189457.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
24 May 189457.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
24 Apr 189760.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
26 Sep 190265.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Meraviglia Mantegazza
Bishop Angelo Maria Meraviglia Mantegazza (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSt. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 268, and Page 496
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017