Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tranquillo Guarneri

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1871BornCastelnuovo Gherardi
1893¹21.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
9 Dec 191544.8AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
16 Jan 191644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
16 Jun 191645.4ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
16 Jun 191645.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
8 Mar 192049.1AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
12 Nov 192655.8AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
21 Jul 193766.5DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tranquillo Guarneri:
Bishop Tranquillo Guarneri (born , died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 61, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013