Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Rizzi

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1874BornPonteterra
17 Apr 189722.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 191338.6AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
25 Jul 191338.8Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
19 Oct 193460.0DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Rizzi:
Bishop Anselmo Rizzi (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 40
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013