Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Porta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

Titular Bishop of Ancusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1866BornMassa Superiore
22 Mar 189023.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 191750.4AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
24 Jun 191750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
28 Dec 195286.2RetiredBishop of Pesaro, Italy
28 Dec 195286.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancusa
15 Dec 195387.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Porta:
Bishop Bonaventura Porta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1917, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013