Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Carlo Liviero

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1866Born
22 Dec 188822.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 191043.6AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
6 Mar 191043.7Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
27 Jun 191044.0InstalledBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
7 Jul 193266.1DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
27 May 2007Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Carlo Liviero
Bishop Bl. Carlo Liviero (born , died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • bl: CB
  • ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast