Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Mancinelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1882BornPontecorvo
31 Jul 190523.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 193148.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
30 Jun 193148.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
6 Sep 193149.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
5 Dec 193351.4SucceededBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
15 Apr 193653.7AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
1 Jan 196279.4DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Mancinelli:
Archbishop Agostino Mancinelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1931, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015