Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Musto

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1905BornMontemiletto
23 Feb 192923.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 195145.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
7 Feb 195145.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bassiana
22 Apr 195145.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bassiana
19 Apr 195246.8SucceededBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
9 Apr 197165.7DiedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio Musto:
Bishop Biagio Musto (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1951, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013