Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto Ronca

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1901BornRoma
7 Apr 192827.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 194847.3AppointedPrelate of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy
21 Jun 194847.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
11 Jul 194847.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
20 Dec 195554.8ResignedPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
25 Sep 197776.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Ronca:
Archbishop Roberto Ronca (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013