Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Celli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy

Titular Bishop of Thapsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1870Born
22 Sep 189222.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 192757.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy
6 May 192757.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
29 Jun 192757.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
17 Oct 195181.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Celli
Bishop Vincenzo Celli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Beatissima Vergine Maria del SS.mo Rosario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast