Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Barbetta

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Pharan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1890Born
29 May 191525.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 196271.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharan
20 May 196272.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharan
14 Jan 197685.6DiedTitular Bishop of Pharan

MicroData Summary for Giulio Barbetta
Bishop Giulio Barbetta (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Pharan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrbetello

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018