Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiavari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1920Born
20 Mar 194323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
7 Sep 197050.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gaeta, Italy
7 Sep 197050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Velia
25 Oct 197050.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velia
22 Feb 197353.0AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
8 Apr 197353.2InstalledBishop of Chiavari, Italy
4 Aug 199575.5RetiredBishop of Chiavari, Italy
20 Dec 200686.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiavari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniele Ferrari
Bishop Daniele Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiavari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComun Nuovo Bergamo

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast