Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calogero Marino

Bishop of Savona-Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1955 Born
30 May 198227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chiavari, Italy
20 Oct 201661.5AppointedBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
17 Dec 201661.7Ordained BishopBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
15 Jan 201761.8InstalledBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Calogero Marino (VIAF: 315123269)
Bishop Calogero Marino (born ) Bishop of Savona-Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopN.S. dell’Orto, Basilica, Chiavari, Diocese of Chiavari

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Savona-Noli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2016
  • ob/c1: CB, 20 Oct 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017