Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Sanguineti

Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1932 Born
29 May 195523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chiavari, Italy
15 Dec 198048.8AppointedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
6 Jan 198148.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
7 Dec 198957.7AppointedBishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy
19 Dec 199866.8AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
28 Feb 199967.0InstalledBishop of Brescia, Italy
19 Jul 200775.4RetiredBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Sanguineti
Bishop Giulio Sanguineti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Giulia di Centaura, Lavagna, Diocese of Chiavari
Ordained PriestNostra Signora dell'Orto, Cathedral, Chiavari, Diocese of Chiavari
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brescia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2007
  • loc/i: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast