Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Sigalini

Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1942 Born
23 Apr 196623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
24 Mar 200562.7AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
15 May 200562.9Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina, Italy
31 Jul 201775.1RetiredBishop of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Sigalini (VIAF: 90093294)
Bishop Domenico Sigalini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDello

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Palestrina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,891
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast