Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Arcari

Apostolic Nuncio to Monaco

Titular Archbishop of Caeciri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1953 Born
11 Jun 197724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
18 Jul 200350.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caeciri
18 Jul 200350.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
20 Sep 200350.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caeciri
12 Dec 200855.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mozambique
5 Jul 201461.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
25 May 201966.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Monaco

MicroData Summary for Antonio Arcari
Archbishop Antonio Arcari (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlacePralboino
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Monaco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,464
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 May 2019

Quantcast