Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Francisco Blanco Méndez

Auxiliary Bishop of San José de Costa Rica

Titular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1973 Born
8 Dec 200027.1Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
28 Nov 201744.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San José de Costa Rica
28 Nov 201744.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
25 Jan 201844.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis

MicroData Summary for Daniel Francisco Blanco Méndez
Bishop Daniel Francisco Blanco Méndez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San José de Costa Rica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José, Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Ordained BishopCathedral, San José, Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast