Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Morstabilini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1907BornGromo S. Giacomo
30 May 193123.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 196254.9AppointedBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy
9 Sep 196255.0Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy
7 Oct 196457.1AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
7 Apr 198375.6RetiredBishop of Brescia, Italy
26 Jul 198981.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Morstabilini:
Bishop Luigi Morstabilini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jul 2014