Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Beschi

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1951 BornBrescia
7 Jun 197523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
25 Mar 200351.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
25 Mar 200351.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vinda
18 May 200351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vinda
22 Jan 200957.5AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
15 Mar 200957.6InstalledBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Beschi:
Bishop Francesco Beschi (born ) Bishop of Bergamo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bergamo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,380
  • c1: CB, 24 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Sep 2014