Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Gervasoni

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1953 BornSarnico
11 Jun 197723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
20 Jul 201359.5AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
28 Sep 201359.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
5 Oct 201359.7InstalledBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Gervasoni:
Bishop Maurizio Gervasoni (born ) Bishop of Vigevano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vigevano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015